THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 02:15:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King St W
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queens Blvd
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 06 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ALLISON MACKENZIE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mackenzie (CPSO#: 109451 )
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Business Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King St W
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 911 Queens Blvd
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 06 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. ALLISON MACKENZIE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mackenzie (CPSO#: 109451 )
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 4K9
Business Address: 911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON ELIZABETH MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON ELIZABETH MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016