THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:27:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW, ROMANIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016