THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:00:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Gastroenterology
13 Jul 2016 to 26 Jul 2016
Queen's University
EL - Gastroenterology
29 Jun 2016 to 12 Jul 2016
McMaster University
EL - Gastroenterology
15 Jun 2016 to 28 Jun 2016
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: EL - Gastroenterology
DATE: 13 Jul 2016 to 26 Jul 2016
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: EL - Gastroenterology
DATE: 29 Jun 2016 to 12 Jul 2016
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Gastroenterology
DATE: 15 Jun 2016 to 28 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2016