THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:11:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6474633953
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 393 King Street East
Breaking The Cycle
Toronto Ontario M5A 1L3
Phone: 6474633953
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6474633953
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 393 King Street East
Breaking The Cycle
Toronto Ontario M5A 1L3
Phone: 6474633953
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANNAH KATHLEEN JENKINS OATLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OATLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANNAH KATHLEEN JENKINS OATLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OATLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Jul 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016