THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:08:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Ave, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Ave, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WHITNEY LAUREL MON-NGA QUONG shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. QUONG is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. QUONG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. QUONG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. QUONG shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. QUONG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. QUONG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WHITNEY LAUREL MON-NGA QUONG shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. QUONG is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. QUONG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. QUONG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. QUONG shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. QUONG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. QUONG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
01 Jan 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
01 Jul 2025 to 31 Dec 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
01 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Clinician Investigator Program
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Clinician Investigator Program
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jan 2026 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 31 Dec 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Clinician Investigator Program
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Clinician Investigator Program
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Oct 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016