THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:28:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 185 Mitton St N
Sarnia ON N7T 6H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193328040
Fax: 5193320499

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. JOHN MATHESON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Apr 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 185 Mitton St N
Sarnia ON N7T 6H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193328040
Fax: 5193320499

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. JOHN MATHESON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Apr 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN LACHLAN MATHESON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHESON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN LACHLAN MATHESON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATHESON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016