THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:15:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC - Children's Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: LHSC - Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: LHSC - University Hopsital
339 Winderemere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: 5196676619
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 26 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC - Children's Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: LHSC - Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: LHSC - University Hopsital
339 Winderemere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: 5196676619
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 26 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Sep 2023
25 Sep 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 26 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Sep 25 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ENRIQUETA LUCAR FIGUEROA may practise neurosurgery at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) London Health Sciences Centre - Children's Hospital in London, Ontario;

(ii) London Health Sciences Centre - Victoria Hospital in London, Ontario; and

(iii) London Health Sciences Centre - University Hospital in London, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. LUCAR FIGUEROA’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. LUCAR FIGUEROA’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. LUCAR FIGUEROA’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 26 September, 2023, and will expire on or before 25 September, 2026, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ENRIQUETA LUCAR FIGUEROA may practise neurosurgery at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) London Health Sciences Centre - Children's Hospital in London, Ontario;

(ii) London Health Sciences Centre - Victoria Hospital in London, Ontario; and

(iii) London Health Sciences Centre - University Hospital in London, Ontario.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires three years from the date of issuance or when Dr. LUCAR FIGUEROA’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. LUCAR FIGUEROA’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. LUCAR FIGUEROA’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 26 September, 2023, and will expire on or before 25 September, 2026, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 25 Sep 2026

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016