THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:35:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3200 Dufferin Street
Suite 401
Toronto Ontario M6A 3B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 233 3075
Fax: 416 233 5328
Address: 790 Bay St
Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
Unit 700
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 551-6006
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Lawrence Avenue West
suite 360
Toronto Ontario M6A 3B4
Phone: 6478122113
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3200 Dufferin Street
Suite 401
Toronto Ontario M6A 3B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 233 3075
Fax: 416 233 5328
Address: 790 Bay St
Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
Unit 700
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 551-6006
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Lawrence Avenue West
suite 360
Toronto Ontario M6A 3B4
Phone: 6478122113
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROXANA SIMINA CHIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROXANA SIMINA CHIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016