THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:52:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 166 Brock St
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-544-3400
Extension: 2306
Fax: 613-544-9560

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 166 Brock St
Kingston ON K7L 5G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-544-3400
Extension: 2306
Fax: 613-544-9560

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Perth
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
LOCATION: Perth

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSHUA NATHANIEL DURBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURBIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSHUA NATHANIEL DURBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURBIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016