THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:34:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Peninsula College of Med. & Dentistry, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cotton Mill Medical Centre
108 - 703 Cotton Mill St
Cornwall Ontario K6H 0E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 933-2686
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jul 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Peninsula College of Med. & Dentistry, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cotton Mill Medical Centre
108 - 703 Cotton Mill St
Cornwall Ontario K6H 0E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 933-2686
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jul 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 20 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANNAH PATRICIA COOKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOKSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANNAH PATRICIA COOKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOKSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Peninsula College of Med. & Dentistry, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2016