THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 03:18:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Church St
A3S
York ON M9N 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162434218
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1000 Depalma Dr
Cobourg ON K9A 5W6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
F2
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Church Street
A3S
Toronto Ontario M9N 1N7
Phone: 4162498111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Church St
A3S
York ON M9N 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162434218
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1000 Depalma Dr
Cobourg ON K9A 5W6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
F2
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Church Street
A3S
Toronto Ontario M9N 1N7
Phone: 4162498111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KYLE LUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KYLE LUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016