THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:05:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Hospital Road
Whitehorse Yukon Y1A 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 867-393-8700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Nova Scotia
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Hospital Road
Whitehorse Yukon Y1A 3H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 867-393-8700
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Nova Scotia
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRA BROOKE MACLENNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLENNAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRA BROOKE MACLENNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLENNAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016