THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 18:55:45 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 27 Jul 2020
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
19 Nov 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2019 to 18 Nov 2019
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
28 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2018 to 27 Aug 2018
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 27 Jul 2020
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 19 Nov 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 18 Nov 2019
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 28 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 27 Aug 2018
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Jul 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016