THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:59:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 107-1275 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3J 0L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-341-0281
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 25 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kailyn B. Sutherland Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Brandon Sutherland (CPSO#: 109831 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2
778-986-9389

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 107-1275 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3J 0L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-341-0281
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 25 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kailyn B. Sutherland Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Brandon Sutherland (CPSO#: 109831 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2
778-986-9389

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAILYN BRANDON SUTHERLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRANDON SUTHERLAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAILYN BRANDON SUTHERLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRANDON SUTHERLAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Sep 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016