THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:51:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
01 Jul 2019 to 29 Jul 2019
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Queen's University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 29 Jul 2019
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016