THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:59:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016