THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:27:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 164 Queen St E
Suite 210
Brampton ON L6V 1B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-456-6816
Fax: 905-456-0490
Address: Suite 201
5025 Yonge St
Toronto Ontario M2N5P2
Phone: 647-846-3777
Fax: 647-846-3779

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 164 Queen St E
Suite 210
Brampton ON L6V 1B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-456-6816
Fax: 905-456-0490
Address: Suite 201
5025 Yonge St
Toronto Ontario M2N5P2
Phone: 647-846-3777
Fax: 647-846-3779

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JOSEPH ROBERT BAJZATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAJZATH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JOSEPH ROBERT BAJZATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAJZATH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Nov 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016