THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:21:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L122-2075 Bayview Ave
Department of Medicine
Room C410
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6100 Ext4290
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-461-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
General Internal Medicine
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L122-2075 Bayview Ave
Department of Medicine
Room C410
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-480-6100 Ext4290
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
East York ON M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-461-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Credit Valley Hospital
General Internal Medicine
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHE JOSEPH PAUL LANGLOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGLOIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHE JOSEPH PAUL LANGLOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGLOIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Dec 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016