THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:27:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Steeles Ave W
WELL Health - Main Exchange
Lower Level
Suite 4A
Thornhill ON L4J 7L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057386699
Fax: 9057386073
Address: 14872 Yonge St
Enhanced Care Clinic – Aurora Yonge
Aurora ON L4G 1N2
Phone: (905) 505-0950
Fax: 905-841-9404
Address: 596 Davis Dr
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Paediatrics
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1440 Bathurst St
Kidcrew Medical
Toronto ON M5R 3J3
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: 647-689-2371

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 17 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Steeles Ave W
WELL Health - Main Exchange
Lower Level
Suite 4A
Thornhill ON L4J 7L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057386699
Fax: 9057386073
Address: 14872 Yonge St
Enhanced Care Clinic – Aurora Yonge
Aurora ON L4G 1N2
Phone: (905) 505-0950
Fax: 905-841-9404
Address: 596 Davis Dr
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Paediatrics
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1440 Bathurst St
Kidcrew Medical
Toronto ON M5R 3J3
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: 647-689-2371

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 17 Nov 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEI XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEI XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016