THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:36:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER ANNE RUTH OSLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER ANNE RUTH OSLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016