THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:25:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1379 Idylwood Road
London Ontario N5V 3V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +48576854289
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Saskatchewan
USA - Arizona
USA - Arkansas
USA - California
USA - Kentucky
USA - Michigan
USA - Montana
USA - New Jersey
USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - Vermont

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance Stratford
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. WOZNIAK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Mar 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1379 Idylwood Road
London Ontario N5V 3V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +48576854289
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - Saskatchewan
USA - Arizona
USA - Arkansas
USA - California
USA - Kentucky
USA - Michigan
USA - Montana
USA - New Jersey
USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - Vermont

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
South Huron Hospital Association Exeter
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance Stratford
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: South Huron Hospital Association
LOCATION: Exeter

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

HOSPITAL: Alexandra Marine and General Hospital
LOCATION: Goderich

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. WOZNIAK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Mar 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARTUR LUKASZ WOZNIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOZNIAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARTUR LUKASZ WOZNIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOZNIAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016