THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:00:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 168 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5V 2R4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167038480
Fax: 4167038479
Address: 4-1278 Dundas St W
Connect-Clinic
Toronto ON M6J 1X7
Phone: (647) 670-0493
Fax: 437-317-9843

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 168 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5V 2R4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167038480
Fax: 4167038479
Address: 4-1278 Dundas St W
Connect-Clinic
Toronto ON M6J 1X7
Phone: (647) 670-0493
Fax: 437-317-9843

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CINDY ADHIAMBO OCHIENG MITULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OCHIENG MITULA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CINDY ADHIAMBO OCHIENG MITULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OCHIENG MITULA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016