THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:19:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: Senaratne, Rhandi (Used Until: 23 Mar 2012)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurology
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Kilgour Road
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R8
Phone: 416-425-6220
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: Senaratne, Rhandi (Used Until: 23 Mar 2012)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 555 University Avenue
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurology
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-1500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 150 Kilgour Road
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
Toronto Ontario M4G 1R8
Phone: 416-425-6220
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RHANDI CHRISTENSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRISTENSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RHANDI CHRISTENSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRISTENSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Mar 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016