THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:16:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics and Genomics
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics and Genomics
23 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
01 Jul 2021 to 22 Sep 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
23 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
01 Jul 2019 to 22 Sep 2019
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
23 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
01 Jul 2018 to 22 Sep 2018
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
01 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Toronto
PEAP - R - Medical Genetics and Genomics
01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE: 23 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 22 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE: 23 Sep 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 22 Sep 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE: 23 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 22 Sep 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE: 23 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 22 Sep 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE: 23 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE: 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Medical Genetics and Genomics
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016