THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:54:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Boston University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3935 Kincaid Street
Burnaby British Columbia V5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 601-434-4211
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2245 Kingsway
Vancouver British Columbia V5N
Phone: 604-565-5485
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Boston University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3935 Kincaid Street
Burnaby British Columbia V5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 601-434-4211
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2245 Kingsway
Vancouver British Columbia V5N
Phone: 604-565-5485
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIVIAN FAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIVIAN FAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Boston University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016