THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:08:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Costa Rica, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Carlton Skin Clinic
187 Carlton St
Toronto ON M5A 2K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6478008977
Fax: No Information Available
Address: SKiN Health
1176 Division Street
Cobourg Ontario K9A 4J9
Phone: (289) 252-2366
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 31 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Costa Rica

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Costa Rica, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Carlton Skin Clinic
187 Carlton St
Toronto ON M5A 2K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6478008977
Fax: No Information Available
Address: SKiN Health
1176 Division Street
Cobourg Ontario K9A 4J9
Phone: (289) 252-2366
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 31 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Costa Rica

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Aug 2024
30 Aug 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 23 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Aug 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. FABIAN RODRIGUEZ BOLANOS may practise dermatology at the following locations:

(i) Carlton Skin Clinic in Toronto, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(ii) SKiN Health in Cobourg, Ontario and SKiN Health in Peterborough, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires on August 30, 2026 or when Dr. RODRIGUEZ BOLANOS’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisors notify the College of any concerns regarding Dr. RODRIGUEZ BOLANOS’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, do not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisors are no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. RODRIGUEZ BOLANOS’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 31 August, 2023, and will expire on or before 30 August, 2026, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. FABIAN RODRIGUEZ BOLANOS may practise dermatology at the following locations:

(i) Carlton Skin Clinic in Toronto, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(ii) SKiN Health in Cobourg, Ontario and SKiN Health in Peterborough, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires on August 30, 2026 or when Dr. RODRIGUEZ BOLANOS’s eligibility to take the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisors notify the College of any concerns regarding Dr. RODRIGUEZ BOLANOS’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, do not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisors are no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. RODRIGUEZ BOLANOS’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 31 August, 2023, and will expire on or before 30 August, 2026, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Costa Rica, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Aug 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016