THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:50:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Ontario Forensic Pathology Service
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 16473291320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Pathology
Effective: 27 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Pathology
Effective: 01 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Ontario Forensic Pathology Service
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 16473291320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Pathology
Effective: 27 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Pathology
Effective: 01 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNARD TADEUSZ PAWLOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAWLOWICZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNARD TADEUSZ PAWLOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAWLOWICZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016