THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:30:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lille II, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
David Braley Research Institute
237 Barton St East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-297-3479
Extension: 40632
Fax: 905-297-3789

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 01 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
France

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Lille II, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
David Braley Research Institute
237 Barton St East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-297-3479
Extension: 40632
Fax: 905-297-3789

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 01 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
France

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Mar 2023
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 01 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Marie Eva Pigeyre may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Endocrinology and Metabolism, McMaster University, in
which Dr. Pigeyre holds an academic appointment at the rank of
Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Pigeyre no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Pigeyre's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Pigeyre's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2019. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2026.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Marie Eva Pigeyre may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Endocrinology and Metabolism, McMaster University, in
which Dr. Pigeyre holds an academic appointment at the rank of
Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Pigeyre no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Pigeyre's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Pigeyre's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2019. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lille II, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2016