THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 09:43:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - District of Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sean Prabhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - District of Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sean Prabhu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 31 Jan 2025
Summary of Decision:
On January 31, 2025, the Tribunal found that Dr. Prabhu:
  • engaged in sexual abuse of a patient by engaging in a physical sexual encounter with Patient A; paying Patient A money in relation to the encounter; and sending inappropriate sexual communications to Patient A.
  • engaged in disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional conduct during the College’s investigation, including asking Patient A to withdraw her complaint to the College; having Patient A send an email to the College investigator purporting to withdraw the complaint; and deleting electronic communications from his devices.
The Tribunal ordered that: 
  1. Dr. Prabhu attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar revoke Dr. Prabhu’s certificate of registration effective February 1, 2025 at 12:01 a.m.; 
  3. Dr. Prabhu pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by February 28, 2025.
  4. Dr. Prabhu to reimburse the College $17,940 for funding provided for therapy and counselling under s. 85.7 of the Health Professions Procedural Code and to post security acceptable to the College to guarantee the payment of this amount, by February 28, 2025.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Statement of Uncontested  Facts and Plea of No Contest and Agreed Statement of Facts on Penalty, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at tribunal@opsdt.ca
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 31 Jan 2025
Summary of Decision:
On January 31, 2025, the Tribunal found that Dr. Prabhu:
  • engaged in sexual abuse of a patient by engaging in a physical sexual encounter with Patient A; paying Patient A money in relation to the encounter; and sending inappropriate sexual communications to Patient A.
  • engaged in disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional conduct during the College’s investigation, including asking Patient A to withdraw her complaint to the College; having Patient A send an email to the College investigator purporting to withdraw the complaint; and deleting electronic communications from his devices.
The Tribunal ordered that: 
  1. Dr. Prabhu attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar revoke Dr. Prabhu’s certificate of registration effective February 1, 2025 at 12:01 a.m.; 
  3. Dr. Prabhu pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by February 28, 2025.
  4. Dr. Prabhu to reimburse the College $17,940 for funding provided for therapy and counselling under s. 85.7 of the Health Professions Procedural Code and to post security acceptable to the College to guarantee the payment of this amount, by February 28, 2025.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Statement of Uncontested  Facts and Plea of No Contest and Agreed Statement of Facts on Penalty, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at tribunal@opsdt.ca
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
For more details please visit the OPSDT website

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Revocation by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. Effective: 01 Feb 2025
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 09 Feb 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Jan 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Revocation by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2025

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2016