THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:52:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 27 Sep 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
04 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
McMaster University
EL - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
01 Aug 2016 to 26 Aug 2016
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 27 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 04 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: EL - Pediatric Critical Care Medicine
DATE: 01 Aug 2016 to 26 Aug 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Sep 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2016