THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:49:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Leicester, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 38 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Markham ON L3P 2L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-7373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 110 Copper Creek Dr
Suite 205
Markham Stouffville Cardiology
Markham ON L6B 0P9
Phone: (905) 472-9200
Fax: (905) 472-9206
Address: 280 West Beaver Creek Road
Unit L7
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3Z1
Phone: 905-709-3690
Fax: 647-367-8822

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Leicester, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 38 Church St
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Markham ON L3P 2L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-472-7373
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 110 Copper Creek Dr
Suite 205
Markham Stouffville Cardiology
Markham ON L6B 0P9
Phone: (905) 472-9200
Fax: (905) 472-9206
Address: 280 West Beaver Creek Road
Unit L7
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3Z1
Phone: 905-709-3690
Fax: 647-367-8822

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS WAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS WAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Leicester, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2016