THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:47:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Valencia, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CATALAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L H S C
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196633279
Fax: 5196633296

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 May 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ana Suller Marti medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CATALAN, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Valencia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L H S C
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196633279
Fax: 5196633296

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 May 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ana Suller Marti medicine professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Aug 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 08 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANA SULLER MARTI may practise medicine independently in neurology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ANA SULLER MARTI may practise medicine independently in neurology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Valencia, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Aug 2024
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 May 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 May 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 May 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2016