THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:19:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201B-190 Cundles Rd E
Atrium Medical Centre
Barrie ON L4M 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-410-0724
Fax: 705-252-0085

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jan 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 13 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tessaro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201B-190 Cundles Rd E
Atrium Medical Centre
Barrie ON L4M 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-410-0724
Fax: 705-252-0085

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jan 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 13 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tessaro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRACEY KATRINA TESSARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESSARO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRACEY KATRINA TESSARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESSARO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Apr 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2016