THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:07:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 124 Merton St
AM EYES
Suite 403
Toronto ON M4S 2Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165197404
Fax: 4169251335
Address: 1110 Sheppard Ave E
Envision Eye Institute
Suite 404
North York ON M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 572-5955
Fax: (416) 572-5959

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 124 Merton St
AM EYES
Suite 403
Toronto ON M4S 2Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165197404
Fax: 4169251335
Address: 1110 Sheppard Ave E
Envision Eye Institute
Suite 404
North York ON M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 572-5955
Fax: (416) 572-5959

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIM THIEN LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIM THIEN LE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2021
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2016