THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:16:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
23 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Queen's University
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
01 Jul 2018 to 22 Sep 2018
Queen's University
EL - Cardiology
20 Aug 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
Queen's University
PEAP - R - Cardiology
05 Aug 2016 to 19 Aug 2016
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 23 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 22 Sep 2018
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: EL - Cardiology
DATE: 20 Aug 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Cardiology
DATE: 05 Aug 2016 to 19 Aug 2016
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2016