THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 05:09:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Isfahan University, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Division of Internal Medicine
CPCR Building, Room L2128
501 Smyth Rd, Ottawa
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-739-6739
Fax: 613-739-6833

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Apr 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Isfahan University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Division of Internal Medicine
CPCR Building, Room L2128
501 Smyth Rd, Ottawa
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-739-6739
Fax: 613-739-6833

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Apr 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Feb 2023
31 Mar 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 10 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Mar 31 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Reza Naghdi may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of General Internal Medicine, University of Ottawa, in
which Dr. Naghdi holds an academic appointment at the rank of
Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Naghdi no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Naghdi's clinical
performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Naghdi's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on April 9, 2020, and expires on March 31,
2027. Upon renewal of Dr. Naghdi's academic appointment at the
University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the
limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Reza Naghdi may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of General Internal Medicine, University of Ottawa, in
which Dr. Naghdi holds an academic appointment at the rank of
Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Naghdi no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Naghdi's clinical
performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Naghdi's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on April 9, 2020, and expires on March 31,
2027. Upon renewal of Dr. Naghdi's academic appointment at the
University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the
limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Isfahan University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Mar 2027
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Mar 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2016