THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:09:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9301 Bathurst Street, Unit # 8
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-237-7472
Fax: (905) 918-0037

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9301 Bathurst Street, Unit # 8
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-237-7472
Fax: (905) 918-0037

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IGOR PORTNOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORTNOI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IGOR PORTNOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORTNOI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2016