THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:56:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 05 Sep 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients can access a copy of their medical record by contacting the Accucare Medical Centre:

#401-520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough, ON
M1R 0B1
Tel: 416-642-0067
Fax: 416-293-9984
Date Received: 30 Jun 2023

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jody Huynh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jul 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 05 Sep 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients can access a copy of their medical record by contacting the Accucare Medical Centre:

#401-520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough, ON
M1R 0B1
Tel: 416-642-0067
Fax: 416-293-9984
Date Received: 30 Jun 2023

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jody Huynh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Jul 2023

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 Feb 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 16 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Jody Huynh may practise medicine independently in outpatient paediatrics,
only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Jody Huynh may practise medicine independently in outpatient paediatrics,
only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Feb 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2016