THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 05:03:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Division of General Internal Medicine
14EN-216
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163404800
Fax: 4165955826

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tony Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chan (CPSO#: 110830 )
Business Address: 610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C1
(416) 946-2000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Division of General Internal Medicine
14EN-216
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163404800
Fax: 4165955826

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tony Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Chan (CPSO#: 110830 )
Business Address: 610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C1
(416) 946-2000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TONY CHI-TONG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TONY CHI-TONG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Oct 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2016