THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:38:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Macsteven Drive
unit c
Picton
Prince Edward Ontario K0K 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-707-7712
Fax: 613-476-1559

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Oct 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11 Macsteven Drive
unit c
Picton
Prince Edward Ontario K0K 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-707-7712
Fax: 613-476-1559

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Oct 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY-KATHRYN BLACKBYRNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACKBYRNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY-KATHRYN BLACKBYRNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACKBYRNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Oct 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2016