THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:22:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: MyRecorDrs
PO Box 621
Bobcaygeon
ON K0M 1A0 
Date Received: 06 Oct 2023

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Satvir S. Sahans Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sahans (CPSO#: 110837 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: MyRecorDrs
PO Box 621
Bobcaygeon
ON K0M 1A0 
Date Received: 06 Oct 2023

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Satvir S. Sahans Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sahans (CPSO#: 110837 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SATVIR SINGH SAHANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHANS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SATVIR SINGH SAHANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHANS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2016