THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:10:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 710 Second Line East
Great Lakes Clinic
Unit 6
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 4K3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055740101
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KIRAN WAQAS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 710 Second Line East
Great Lakes Clinic
Unit 6
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 4K3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055740101
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KIRAN WAQAS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRAN WAQAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAQAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRAN WAQAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAQAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2016