THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:41:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Liverpool School of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-225 Richmond St W
Map[e Clinic Telemedicine
No House Calls
Toronto ON M5V 1W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: 1 844 629 5617

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Feb 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 09 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Liverpool School of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-225 Richmond St W
Map[e Clinic Telemedicine
No House Calls
Toronto ON M5V 1W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 497-7453
Fax: 1 844 629 5617

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Feb 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 09 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELEN LUCY GRIFFITHS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIFFITHS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HELEN LUCY GRIFFITHS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRIFFITHS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Liverpool School of Medicine, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Aug 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 May 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2016