THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:56:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Department
Ground Floor
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 596-4200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Emergency Department
Ground Floor
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 596-4200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN HARRIS HARDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARDY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN HARRIS HARDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARDY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Oct 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Oct 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2016