THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:20:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 640 Ford Drive
Oakville, Ontario
L6J 7V7
Oakville Ontario L6J 7V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058159990
Fax: 9053387863

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Synthiya Vikneswaralingam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vikneswaralingam (CPSO#: 110916 )
Business Address: 640 Ford Dr
Oakville ON L6J 7V7
9058159990

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 640 Ford Drive
Oakville, Ontario
L6J 7V7
Oakville Ontario L6J 7V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058159990
Fax: 9053387863

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Synthiya Vikneswaralingam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vikneswaralingam (CPSO#: 110916 )
Business Address: 640 Ford Dr
Oakville ON L6J 7V7
9058159990

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYNTHIYA VIKNESWARALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIKNESWARALINGAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYNTHIYA VIKNESWARALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIKNESWARALINGAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Sep 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2016