THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:19:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2004
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Huron Medical Centre
1472 Huron St
London, ON N5V 2E5
Date Received: 13 Jun 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thind Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Feb 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Huron Medical Centre
1472 Huron St
London, ON N5V 2E5
Date Received: 13 Jun 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thind Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Feb 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 13 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2016