THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:34:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Autonomous University of Santo Domingo, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Autonomous University of Santo Domingo, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Autonomous University of Santo Domingo, 2006
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Queen's University
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
03 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Queen's University
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
26 Sep 2016 to 02 Dec 2016
Queen's University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 03 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiology
DATE: 26 Sep 2016 to 02 Dec 2016
UNIVERSITY: Queen's University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2016