THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:48:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Favaloro, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 521 2100
Extension: 40533
Fax: 905 577 1427
Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-296-6477
Fax: 905 577 1427

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Oct 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashkan Shoamanesh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Favaloro, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 521 2100
Extension: 40533
Fax: 905 577 1427
Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-296-6477
Fax: 905 577 1427

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Oct 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashkan Shoamanesh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
02 Aug 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 02 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Luciana Catanese may practise medicine independently in neurology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Luciana Catanese may practise medicine independently in neurology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Favaloro, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2016