THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 05:03:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106 Victoria St. W. 2nd Floor
Alliston Ontario L9R 1Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 435-0080
Fax: (705) 435-0083

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106 Victoria St. W. 2nd Floor
Alliston Ontario L9R 1Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 435-0080
Fax: (705) 435-0083

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN WOLAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN WOLAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Oct 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2016