THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 02:57:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: Bautista, Maria Rhida Mongcopa (Used Until: 17 Oct 2021)
Medical School: University of the Philippines Manila College of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Bautista, Maria Rhida Mongcopa (Used Until: 17 Oct 2021)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Philippines Manila College of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Philippines Manila College of Medicine, 2000
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
10 Dec 2021 to 30 Sep 2022
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Oct 2021 to 16 Dec 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Sep 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Oct 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Sep 2020
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Oct 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2019 to 30 Sep 2019
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Oct 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Sep 2018
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
17 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Hematology
01 Oct 2016 to 16 Dec 2016
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 10 Dec 2021 to 30 Sep 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Oct 2021 to 16 Dec 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Oct 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Sep 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Oct 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Sep 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Oct 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Sep 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 17 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Hematology
DATE: 01 Oct 2016 to 16 Dec 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2016